Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 09:57:49 (UTC).

KRISTINE SIMONYAN VS ANTHONY JOHN GIOVANNETTI

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 KRISTINE SIMONYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANTHONY JOHN GIOVANNETTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6372

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIMONYAN KRISTINE

Defendant

GIOVANNETTI ANTHONY JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KSACHUKYAN VARDAN

Defendant Attorney

MICHAELSON LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/4/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/4/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/21/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/13/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Anthony John Giovannetti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Anthony John Giovannetti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Anthony John Giovannetti (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kristine Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kristine Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristine Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kristine Simonyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KSACHUKYAN VARDAN