This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 12:33:15 (UTC).

KRISTINE BOYADZHYAN VS JOHN CHARKY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 KRISTINE BOYADZHYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN CHARKY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2367

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOYADZHYAN KRISTINE

Defendants

ALCON LABORATORIES INC.

CHARKY JOHN

LEASE PLAN U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATEVOSIAN VAHAG

Defendant Attorney

SCHONBUCH MICHAEL NEIL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/7/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2024
  • Hearing11/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John Charky (Defendant); Alcon Laboratories, Inc. (Defendant); Lease Plan U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by John Charky (Defendant); Alcon Laboratories, Inc. (Defendant); Lease Plan U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kristine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kristine Boyadzhyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Alcon Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEASE PLAN U.S.A., INC is a litigant