This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 07:18:36 (UTC).

KRISTINA DJANGOULIAN VS HOLLEY MANAGEMENT, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 KRISTINA DJANGOULIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HOLLEY MANAGEMENT, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1723

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DJANGOULIAN KRISTINA DBA CRYSTAL MEDICAL TRANSPORT CORPORATION

Defendants

3349 CAHUENGA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

HOLLEY MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAHMAZIAN JILBERT ESQ.

TAHMAZIAN JILBERT

Defendant Attorneys

BREMER KEITH

FREEDMAN KENNETH A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/20/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/7/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Answer

7/2/2021: Answer

Answer

7/28/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

8/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Order

8/25/2021: Case Management Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Holley Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Holley Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by 3349 Cahuenga, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Holley Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kristina Djangoulian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less