This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 21:05:51 (UTC).

KRISTINA COCOLI VS STARDUST INTERNATIONAL CORP. D/B/A/ LENON

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 KRISTINA COCOLI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against STARDUST INTERNATIONAL CORP D/B/A/ LENON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8797

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCOLI KRISTINA

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

STARDUST INTERNATIONAL CORP. D/B/A/ LENON

Cross Defendant

HOLLYWOOD MODEL MANAGEMENT INC. CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A

AGHAJANI ANI

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

MYUNG S. CALVIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

7/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

8/24/2021: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

9/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

9/10/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

9/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/20/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/16/2021

9/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 09/16/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/7/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Hearing02/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 09/16/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Stardust International Corp. d/b/a/ Lenon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Stardust International Corp. d/b/a/ Lenon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stardust International Corp. d/b/a/ Lenon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Stardust International Corp. d/b/a/ Lenon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kristina Cocoli (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD MODEL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYUNG S. CALVIN