This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 18:26:01 (UTC).

KRISTINA COCOLI COCOLI VS LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 KRISTINA COCOLI COCOLI filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LOLA SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2672

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COCOLI KRISTINA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP INC.

Cross Defendant

MERAKI MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THIGPEN JORDANNA

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DIBA KASEY

ALAVI AMIR TAHER

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

10/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES KRISTINA COCOLI;

8/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES KRISTINA COCOLI;

Answer

7/14/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

7/14/2021: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

7/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER) OF 06/30/2021

6/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMURRER) OF 06/30/2021

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY RE: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT'S REPLY RE: MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

6/2/2021: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Hearing05/26/2022 at 11:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (KRISTINA COCOLI;); Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer) of 06/30/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketReply (Defendant's Reply re: Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint); Filed by LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketOpposition (PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT); Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer; Filed by LOLA & SOTO BUSINESS GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KRISTINA COCOLI (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLLYWOOD MODEL MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THIGPEN JORDANNA G.