This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 01:21:10 (UTC).

KRISTIE MATHIS VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 KRISTIE MATHIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK V. MOONEY, MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9438

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK V. MOONEY

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATHIS KRISTIE

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ARNOLD JOSHUA

ARNOLD JOSHUA M.

ALEXANDER J. BERNARD III

RAMIREZ-GALVEZ DAVID

Defendant Attorney

DANIELS JACOB W

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

3/10/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND (PROPOSED) ORDER

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/24/2020: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/30/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

8/10/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

8/10/2020: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF REQUESTS AND RESPONSE IN

8/31/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF REQUESTS AND RESPONSE IN

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACOB W. DANIELS ISO SCE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S RPD SET 2 AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

8/31/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACOB W. DANIELS ISO SCE'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S RPD SET 2 AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Opposition - OPPOSITION SCE'S OPP TO PLAINTIFF' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RPD SET 2, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

8/31/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION SCE'S OPP TO PLAINTIFF' MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RPD SET 2, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

9/4/2020: Reply - REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT

Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL

9/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE DESIGNATION OF COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES;)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES;)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (PROPOSED)

12/5/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (PROPOSED)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: NOTICE OF OF RELATED CASES

11/19/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE: NOTICE OF OF RELATED CASES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/04/2019

11/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/04/2019

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF KRISTIE MATHISS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS LATE-FILED OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

10/23/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF KRISTIE MATHISS OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS LATE-FILED OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Notice of Related Case

10/15/2019: Notice of Related Case

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND (PROPOSED) ORDER); Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Reassignment to the Honorable Mark V. Mooney); Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • Docketat 10:10 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kristie Mathis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAMIREZ-GALVEZ DAVID