This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 05:58:20 (UTC).

KRISTEN WALL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LISA EHRLICH, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 KRISTEN WALL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LISA EHRLICH, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0672

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALL AN INDIVIDUAL KRISTEN

Defendants

EHRLICH AN INDIVIDUAL LISA

FML MANAGEMENT AN ENTITY

LURLINE GARDENS LIMITED HOUSING AN ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/8/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/8/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/9/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/12/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F51 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Chatsworth Courthouse in Department F51 - Hon. Andrew E. Coopereffective 04/17/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Randy Rhodes in Department F51 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KRISTEN WALL, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LISA EHRLICH, an Individual (Defendant); FML MANAGEMENT, AN ENTITY (Defendant); LURLINE GARDENS LIMITED HOUSING, AN ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KRISTEN WALL, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LISA EHRLICH, an Individual (Defendant); FML MANAGEMENT, AN ENTITY (Defendant); LURLINE GARDENS LIMITED HOUSING, AN ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KRISTEN WALL, an Individual (Plaintiff); As to: LISA EHRLICH, an Individual (Defendant); FML MANAGEMENT, AN ENTITY (Defendant); LURLINE GARDENS LIMITED HOUSING, AN ENTITY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less