Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/25/2021 at 12:52:49 (UTC).

KRISTEN BERMUDEZ-GUTIERREZ, ET AL. VS PACTRANS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 KRISTEN BERMUDEZ-GUTIERREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PACTRANS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9096

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MAYA MATTHEW

TORRES SELENA

BERMUDEZ-GUTIERREZ KRISTEN

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PACTRANS LLC

MARTINEZ ANGEL LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN ALAN C

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MACKEY ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

3/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/17/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

1/26/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2023
  • Hearing12/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by PACTRANS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PACTRANS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by PACTRANS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by PACTRANS, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kristen Bermudez-Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Selena Torres (Plaintiff); Matthew Maya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kristen Bermudez-Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Selena Torres (Plaintiff); Matthew Maya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kristen Bermudez-Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Selena Torres (Plaintiff); Matthew Maya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kristen Bermudez-Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Selena Torres (Plaintiff); Matthew Maya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kristen Bermudez-Gutierrez (Plaintiff); Selena Torres (Plaintiff); Matthew Maya (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACTRANS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACKEY ROBERT THOMAS