This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 22:10:59 (UTC).

KRISTA MARIE LI, ET AL. VS MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 KRISTA MARIE LI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MEK ACQUISITIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8376

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LI RAYMOND

LI KRISTA MARIE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA LLC

BARRY KENNETH

GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY

LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

BARRY KENNETH

MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MYERS DAVID A

MYERS DAVID ALLEN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PALUCH DANIEL

PALUCH DANIEL RAPHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

6/29/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT KENNETH BARRY)

2/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CROSS-DEFENDANT KENNETH BARRY)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/19/2021: Notice of Ruling

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

1/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

12/8/2020: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

11/17/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/18/2020: Cross-Complaint

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

11/3/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES COUNTY TAX COLLECTOR

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT;)

11/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT;) OF 11/03/2020

11/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT;) OF 11/03/2020

Notice of Ruling

10/13/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

10/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/24/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • Hearing06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • Hearing03/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Status Conference (ReCross-Defendant Kenneth Barry) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Cross-Defendant Kenneth Barry)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Golden State Finance Authority (Cross-Complainant); YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA, LLC (Defendant); Los Angeles County Tax Collector (Defendant); Golden State Finance Authority (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (of errata re: verified complaint of plaintiffs Krista Marie Li and Raymond Li); Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Krista Marie Li (Plaintiff); Raymond Li (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEK ACQUISITIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where YGRENE ENERGY FUND CALIFORNIA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYERS DAVID A. ESQ.