This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2019 at 06:49:10 (UTC).

KRISINDA GEORGE VS THOMAS A HURD

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 KRISINDA GEORGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMAS A HURD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0630

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

GEORGE KRISINDA

Respondents and Defendants

HURD THOMAS A

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

YARDLEY DAVID R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LONGO DAN L. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/24/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

SUMMONS

10/20/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/20/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by KRISINDA GEORGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • Answer; Filed by THOMAS A HURD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by KRISINDA GEORGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YARDLEY DAVID R. ESQ.