This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 02:02:31 (UTC).

KRIS DE NAVA VS COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 KRIS DE NAVA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GLORIA WHITE-BROWN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0423

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GLORIA WHITE-BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DE NAVA KRIS

Defendants

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DAMONTE ALBERT

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

TEAMSTERS UNION LOCAL 166 A CALIFORNIA UNINCORPORATED ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALCZYNSKI MATTHEW

Defendant Attorney

SHEH WILLIAM YUAN-WEN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

8/10/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

9/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Notice of Ruling

9/22/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF U.S. DISTRICT COURT ORDER AND JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

3/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF U.S. DISTRICT COURT ORDER AND JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND/OR STATUS CONFERENCE

1/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT AND/OR STATUS CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by Mail

11/25/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF VACATUR OF ORDER OF REMAND

11/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF VACATUR OF ORDER OF REMAND

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

10/31/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/31/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Amended Complaint

9/26/2019: Amended Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/26/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) INCORRECT NAME COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

6/21/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) INCORRECT NAME COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Proof of Personal Service

5/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to Appear) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kris De Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal); Filed by Teamsters Union Local 166, a California unincorporated association (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Gloria White-Brown, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (p.o.s) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) (Incorrect Name Costco Wholesale Corporation); Filed by Kris De Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kris De Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kris De Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kris De Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kris De Nava (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEAMSTER UNION LOCAL 572 A LABOR ORGANIZATIN is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant