This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2021 at 07:02:11 (UTC).

KRIS ANNE LOUIS, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 KRIS ANNE LOUIS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7268

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIS AN INDIVIDUAL KRIS ANNE

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

LYFT INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

SEGWAY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

UNITED GRAND CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCBRATNEY DARREN T.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2024
  • Hearing10/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KRIS ANNE LOUIS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KRIS ANNE LOUIS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KRIS ANNE LOUIS, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEGWAY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCBRATNEY DARREN T.