Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 22:51:48 (UTC).

KRG CHAPEL HILL SHOPPING CENTER LLC VS FLIPPIN' PIZZA CHAPEL HILL LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 KRG CHAPEL HILL SHOPPING CENTER LLC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against FLIPPIN' PIZZA CHAPEL HILL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0296

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KRG CHAPEL HILL SHOPPING CENTER LLC

Defendants

FLIPPIN' PIZZA CHAPEL HILL LLC

FLIPPIN' PIZZA INTERNATIONAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KLUEWER JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

9/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION

Application - APPLICATION TO SERVE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

9/21/2020: Application - APPLICATION TO SERVE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

8/31/2020: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Judgment

9/1/2020: Judgment

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [JUDGMENT]

9/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [JUDGMENT]

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON A SISTER STATE JUDGMENT]

9/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON A SISTER STATE JUDGMENT]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketApplication (to Serve California Secretary of State); Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Application); Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Entry of Judgment on a Sister State Judgment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Judgment]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment on a Sister State Judgment); Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KRG Chapel Hill Shopping Center LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLUEWER JOSHUA