This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 10:05:39 (UTC).

KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN VS. MARY KIREJIAN

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MARY KIREJIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CURTIS A. KIN and LAURA A. MATZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7751

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CURTIS A. KIN

LAURA A. MATZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACHIAN KREKOR KOKO

Defendants

KIREJIAN MARY

KIREJIAN HAROUT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF EUGENE ALKANA

ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN

EUGENE S. ALKANA A PROFESSIONAL LAW

Defendant Attorneys

ABKARIAN ALBERT

ALBERT ABKARIAN & ASSOCIATES APLC

MARKARIAN CHRISTOPHER VREJ

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/8/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/17/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Ruling

1/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/25/2021: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/25/2021: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

1/25/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

1/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

1/26/2021: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Judgment - JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)

1/22/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

1/22/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

1/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD)

Petition - PETITION TO CONFIRM FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

12/4/2020: Petition - PETITION TO CONFIRM FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

11/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

8/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

8/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ARBITRATION)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Status Conference (ReArbitration) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order); Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by KREKOR KOKO BACHIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to Comply with Trial Court Delay Reduction Act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: EC067751    Hearing Date: January 22, 2021    Dept: E

PETITION TO CONFIRM FINAL ARBITRATION AWARD

Date: 1/22/21 (8:30 AM)

Case: Krekor Koko Bachian v. Mary Kirejian et al. (EC 067751)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Krekor Koko Bachian’s UNOPPOSED Petition to Confirm Final Arbitration Award is GRANTED. Judgment shall be entered in the favor of plaintiff Krekor Koko Bachian and against defendants Mary Kirejian and Harout Kirejian in the amount of $40,850.00. The Court will enter the proposed judgment received on December 4, 2020.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALKANA EUGENE STEVEN