This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 20:14:28 (UTC).

KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WAG LABS, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WAG LABS, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0328

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KR SUNSET WEHO LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

WAG LABS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITMAN TODD E.

WAGGONER RYAN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/11/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/11/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/11/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/27/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR 30 DAY CONTINUANCE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/21/2021: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR 30 DAY CONTINUANCE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Request for Dismissal

5/20/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketApplication (Application For 30 Day Continuance For Defendant To Respond To Plaintiff?s Complaint; And Order); Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KR SUNSET WEHO, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAG LABS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KR SUNSET WEHO LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WAGGONER RYAN T

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHITMAN TODD E.