This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 05:52:10 (UTC).

KPMC, LLC VS MIDTOWN MART, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 KPMC, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against MIDTOWN MART, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2740

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KPMC LLC

Defendants

MIDTOWN MART INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHUNG YEON MIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTANT MARK ROBERT

Defendant Attorney

CHANG YOUNG K

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGING AND ENTRY OF PROPOSED...)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: LODGING AND ENTRY OF PROPOSED...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)

6/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

6/8/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

6/8/2021: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) OF 06/08/2021

6/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT) OF 06/08/2021

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

6/22/2021: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

6/23/2021: Writ of - WRIT OF POSSESSION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (1/2 HOUR))

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL (1/2 HOUR))

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

5/5/2021: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/5/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTING OF TRIAL) OF 05/06/2021

5/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTING OF TRIAL) OF 05/06/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTING OF TRIAL)

5/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTING OF TRIAL)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Trial Brief

5/18/2021: Trial Brief

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

4/16/2021: Prejudgment Claim of Right to Possession

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docketat 4:30 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: [Proposed] Judgment) of 06/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: [Proposed] Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Lodging and Entry of Proposed Judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Lodging and Entry of Proposed...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 73, Timothy Patrick Dillon, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((1/2 hour)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPrejudgment Claim of Right to Possession; Filed by Yeon Min Chung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yeon Min Chung (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((MIDTOWN MART, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KPMC, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KPMC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG YOUNG K