This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 06:31:30 (UTC).

KOVAC MEDIA GROUP, INC. VS EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE CENTER, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 KOVAC MEDIA GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE CENTER, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3808

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOVAC MEDIA GROUP INC. DBA TENTH STREET ENTERTAINMENT

Defendant

EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE CENTER INC. DBA EPIC INSURANCE BROKERS AND CONSULTANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRID ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

BECKER JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/28/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

7/29/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE

8/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES KOVAC MEDIA GROUP, INC.

8/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES KOVAC MEDIA GROUP, INC.

Case Management Statement

10/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

11/24/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

Order - ORDER STIP - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER

11/24/2021: Order - ORDER STIP - [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • Hearing02/21/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • Hearing02/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • Hearing08/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder (STIP - [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order); Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER); Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE); Filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (KOVAC MEDIA GROUP, INC.); Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edgewood Partners Insurance Center, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kovac Media Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOVAC MEDIA GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EDGEWOOD PARTNERS INSURANCE CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRID ALEXANDER