This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 13:00:36 (UTC).

KOSTIV & ASSOCIATES, P.C., A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION VS CENTRAL PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 KOSTIV ASSOCIATES, P C , A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CENTRAL PLAZA, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1166

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

KOSTIV & ASSOCIATES P.C. A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

KOSTIV PETRO AKA PETER KOSTIV

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

CENTRAL PLAZA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTOYA CESAR O.

Defendant Attorney

OSTROSKY GWENDOLYN

Cross Defendant Attorney

QUIROGA MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/12/2021: Complaint

Substitution of Attorney

10/21/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

10/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

6/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Answer

4/16/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/16/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

4/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

5/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/18/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/22/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/18/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

3/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/12/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2023
  • Hearing03/21/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Hearing02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Hearing01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petro Kostiv (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Ruling); Filed by Central Plaza, LLC, a California limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Cross-Defendant); Petro Kostiv (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Central Plaza, LLC, a California limited liability company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kostiv & Associates, P.C., a California professional corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRL PLAZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KOSTIV & ASSOCIATES PC is a litigant