This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/03/2020 at 08:47:36 (UTC).

KOSSORIS SEARCH, INC. VS KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 KOSSORIS SEARCH, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LISA HART COLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9472

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LISA HART COLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOSSORIS SEARCH INC.

Defendant

KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAPEER PHILIP D.

LAURO JOHN F.

CALIFANO MICHAEL G.

ASHBY JOSEPH R.

MUKASEY MARC

OLIVIERI KATE

Defendant Attorneys

KATTEN MUCHIN & ROSENMAN

LARSEN RYAN JAMES

BRINES ASHLEY TAYLOR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/28/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON ...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON ...) OF 01/23/2020

1/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON ...) OF 01/23/2020

Notice of Settlement

1/17/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

12/16/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUATION OF TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Reply - PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1: TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MADELEINE SELTZER REGARDING THE NALSC CODE OF ETHICS

12/6/2019: Reply - PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO 1: TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MADELEINE SELTZER REGARDING THE NALSC CODE OF ETHICS

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FINIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

12/9/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FINIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

12/2/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RYAN J. LARSEN IN SUPPORT OF KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

12/2/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RYAN J. LARSEN IN SUPPORT OF KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/2/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING KOSSORIS SEARCH INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL

11/4/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING KOSSORIS SEARCH INC.'S MOTION TO SEAL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/11/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/11/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Witness List

10/11/2019: Witness List

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S [PROPOSED] DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

10/15/2019: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S [PROPOSED] DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Declaration - DECLARATION PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION - DECLARATION OF MARC L. MUKASEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KOSSORIS SEARCH INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

10/16/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION - DECLARATION OF MARC L. MUKASEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF KOSSORIS SEARCH INC.'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MADELEINE SELTZER REGARDING NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LEGAL SEARCH

10/16/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION - PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1: TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF MADELEINE SELTZER REGARDING NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF LEGAL SEARCH

91 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KOSSORIS SEARCH, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docketat 3:14 PM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement Filed on ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement Filed on ...) of 01/23/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Continuation of Trial and Final Status Conference); Filed by KATTEN MUCHIN ROSENMAN LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNotice Of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Filed by KOSSORIS SEARCH, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KOSSORIS SEARCH, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KOSSORIS SEARCH, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LARSEN RYAN JAMES