This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2019 at 00:06:07 (UTC).

KOSALA HEMACHANDRA VS TAYLOR MONAHAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/14/2017 KOSALA HEMACHANDRA filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against TAYLOR MONAHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1730

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HEMACHANDRA KOSALA

Defendants and Respondents

MONAHAN TAYLOR

MYETHERWALLET LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YEN WILLIAM W.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/28/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/28/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMONS

12/14/2017: SUMMONS

VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE TO COMPEL INSPECTION AND COPYING OF BOOKS, RECORDS, AND FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS OF CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

12/14/2017: VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE TO COMPEL INSPECTION AND COPYING OF BOOKS, RECORDS, AND FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS OF CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 82; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 82; Non-Appearance Case Review (Non-Appearance (Case Review); Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SELLING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • VERIFIED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE TO COMPEL INSPECTION AND COPYING OF BOOKS, RECORDS, AND FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS OF CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEN WILLIAM W.