Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2019 at 02:27:45 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION VS YOUNG IL LEE ET

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 KOREA RESOLUTION COLLECTION CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against YOUNG IL LEE ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD E. RICO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3669

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD E. RICO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

Defendants, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

LEE YEONG IL

LEE HYUNG G.

LEE YOUNG IL

DOES 1 TO 50

KIM HYUN GI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KAHANA AMIR M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KOLETSKY ROY A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

6/5/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/26/2019: Minute Order

Declaration

2/27/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

11/9/2018: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

11/28/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

9/25/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/1/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/2/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS YOUNG IL LEE AND HYUNG G. LEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS YOUNG IL LEE AND HYUNG G. LEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S OPPOSIT1O TO DEFENDANTS YOUNG IL LEE AND HYUNG G. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

8/9/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S OPPOSIT1O TO DEFENDANTS YOUNG IL LEE AND HYUNG G. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

8/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/22/2018: Minute Order

AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DIUGENCE

5/29/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DIUGENCE

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP ? 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 5002 ABERDEEN COURT, EL MONTE, CA 91731

5/29/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP ? 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 5002 ABERDEEN COURT, EL MONTE, CA 91731

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS YOUNG IL LEE AND HYUNG G. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

6/15/2018: DEFENDANTS YOUNG IL LEE AND HYUNG G. LEE'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT ICAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 17131; ETC

4/26/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT ICAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 17131; ETC

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action); Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Amir M. Kahana, Esq. (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Young Il Lee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 17, Richard E. Rico, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions for Defendant's failure to appear, may include striking of answer) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Defendant's failure to ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DUE DIUGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 5002 ABERDEEN COURT, EL MONTE, CA 91731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT ICAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 17131; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

04/26/18 03:28PM PDT KAHANA LAW, P.C. -> LA - Stanley Mosk Courthou 14422473751 IPg 3/ °

Amir M. Kahana, Esq. (SBN 218149) Samuel Yu, Esq. (SBN 251636)

2|l Mimi Ahn, Esq. (SBN 301035) FILED 3 KAHANA & FELD LLP Superior Court of California 3 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 685 ounty of Los Angeles 4 Santa Ana, CA 92707 ' Telephone (949) 812-4781 APR Facsimile (949) 281-2105 ' 26 2018 5 || E-mail: akahana@kahanafeld.com; Sherri B, Carter, Exgejtive-Sfficer/Clerk syu@kahanafeld.com; mahn@kahanafeld.com By % Deputy 6 o . Ricardo Perez Attorneys for Plaintiff Korea Resolution & . 71| Collection Corporation '

8 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 9 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION | Case No.: B C? 0 8 6 69

1 CORPORATION, a Korean corporation, 12 COMPLAINT FOR: Plaintiff (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN

13 ’ MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CIV. PROC.

v CODE § 1713}; 1all (2) FRAUDULENT TRANSFER; AND

YOUNG IL LEE, an individual also known 3) ggfgggggTWE FRAUDULENT 15]| as YEONG IL LEE; HYUNG G. LEE, an

inc(liividual also known 1as HYUN GI KIM;

" . , 16 || and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive, DE FOR v 17 Defendants.23

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOLETSKY ROY AARON