This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2019 at 00:59:14 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION VS SEI GEE KIM ET

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 KOREA RESOLUTION COLLECTION CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SEI GEE KIM ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3668

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

KIM SEI GEE

KIM GLENN S.

KIM SE GI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHANA AMIR M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

JANET KANG ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/18/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/21/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

9/12/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION LCCP ? 405.21 - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4516 RAMSDELL AVENUE, #110, LA CRESCENTA, CA 91214

9/27/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION LCCP ? 405.21 - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4516 RAMSDELL AVENUE, #110, LA CRESCENTA, CA 91214

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/9/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

8/2/2018: Minute Order

ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT SEI GEE KIM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

8/2/2018: ORDER TO CONTINUE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANT SEI GEE KIM'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEMURRER HEARING

8/2/2018: STIPULATION TO CONTINUE THE DEMURRER HEARING

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SEI GEE KIM'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/23/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SEI GEE KIM'S DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

7/11/2018: NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

7/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

7/6/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4516 RAMSDELL AVENUE, #110, LA CRESCENTA, CA 91214

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4516 RAMSDELL AVENUE, #110, LA CRESCENTA, CA 91214

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT, ETC

6/6/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT, ETC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL.CIV.CODE ? 1713]

6/7/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL.CIV.CODE ? 1713]

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/14/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

4/26/2018: SUMMONS

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2018
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 12; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-10-03 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION LCCP 405.21 - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 4516 RAMSDELL AVENUE, #110, LA CRESCENTA, CA 91214

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Docketat 00:00 AM in Department 12; Court Order (Court Order; Case Deemed Settled) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL.CIV.CODE 1713]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT, ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINTT FOR (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CIV. CODE 1713]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

YOUNG K. CHANG, ESQ. (#164906]

LAW OFFICES OF YOUNG K. CHANG FILED 3580 Wilshire Boulevard, Superior Court of California Suite 1405 CountvnTLoqAnqeles Los Angeles, CA 90010 JUN.07 2018

Telephone: 213-480-1050

Facsimile: 213-480-1028 Sherri . Afjer, catcutive vincer/lerk of Court Bx_gggé%EEZ:zz:::,Deu “1eavistta Rahingnan P ty

Attorney for Defendant,

SEI GEE KIM SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION

Case No.: BC703668 CORPORATION, a Korean '

corporation, [Hon. Barbara A. Meiers Dept. 12] Plaintiff,

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FOR

vVS. (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN

MONEY. JUDGMENT SEI GEE KIM, an individual [CAL.CLV.CODE § 1713] also known as SE GI KIM, also known as GLENN S. KIM; and

DOES 1 through 50, inclusive,

Defendant (s).

attF et sl et s

Defendant, SEI GEE KIM also known as SE GI KIM also known as GLENN S KIM, an individual (“Ansfiering Defendants”), 1n answer to the complaint herein, admits, déhies and alleges as follows:

1. Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure §431.30, Answering Defendant denies generally and specifically each and

every material allegation of plaintiff's complaint.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHANA AMIR MOSHE