This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2019 at 03:39:35 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORP VS SEONG H JEE ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 KOREA RESOLUTION COLLECTION CORP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SEONG H JEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA P. JESSNER and YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3240

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA P. JESSNER

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORP.

Defendants

JEE SEONG H.

LEE KYUNG A. AKA KYUNG AH LEE AKA KYUNGGAH JEE LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

KAHANA AMIR M. ESQ.

KAHANA AMIR MOSHE

Attorney at Kahana & Feld LLP

3 Hutton Centre Dr Ste 685

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

PARK & LIM

LIM SHI YOUNG

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/18/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

3/18/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice

2/1/2019: Notice

Minute Order

2/1/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

10/15/2018: Unknown

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/21/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order

12/4/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/30/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

10/22/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

11/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE REGARDING PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND RE

9/10/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE REGARDING PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND RE

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, S

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, S

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF

PLAINTIFF KORFA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; M

9/4/2018: PLAINTIFF KORFA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT SEONG H. JEE'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; M

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 565 N. MARIPOSA AVENUE, LOS ANGELES, CA 90004

5/4/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 565 N. MARIPOSA AVENUE, LOS ANGELES, CA 90004

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing Regarding Dismissal of Case); Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2] - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 565 N. MARIPOSA AVENUE, LOS ANGELES, CA 90004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF (I) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING, AND (II) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) E1BLFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT (CAL. CIV. CODE 1713];ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

O 00 2 O L & W N

:20PM PST KAHANA " *“1, P.C. -> LA - 5tanley Moeg™ “ourthou 14422473751 Pg 3/3

Amir M. Kahana, Esq. (SBN 218149) FILED

Samuel Yu, Esq. (SBN 251636) Superior Caurt o Calforia

Mimi Ahn, Esq. (SBN 301035)

KAHANA & FELD LLP

3 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 685

Santa Ana, CA 92707 - e

Telephone (949) 812-4781

Facsimile (949) 281-2105

E-mail: akahana{@kahanafeld.com; syu@kahanafeld.com; mahn(@kahanafeld.com

Attorneys for Plaintiff Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION |CaseNo. BC698240 CORPORATION, a Korean corporation, COMPLAINT FOR:

Plaintiff (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN ’ MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CIV. CODE § 1713]; (2) FRAUDULENT TRANSFER; AND SEONG H. JEE, also known as SEONGHOH | ¢®) ggfigggmla FRAUDULENT JEE, also known as SEONG HOH JEE, also known as SEONG JEE, an individual; KYUNG A. LEE, also known as KYUNG AH LEE, also known as KYUNGAH JEE- | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL LEE, an individual; and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive,

Defendants.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHANA AMIR MOSHE