This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 02:24:25 (UTC).

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORP VS JEA UN CHOI ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/09/2018 KOREA RESOLUTION COLLECTION CORP filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JEA UN CHOI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY A. GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3239

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY A. GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION CORPORATION

Defendants and Respondents

HWANG KIL SOOK

CHOI KIL SOOK

CHOI JEAUN

CHOI JAE EUN

CHOI JAE U.

DOES 1 TO 50

CHOI JEA UN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KAHANA AMIR M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

KIM DAVID S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO CONWEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI OFF CALENDAR

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO CONWEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KIL SOOK CHOI OFF CALENDAR

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KIL SOOK CHOI OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP ? 405.2] PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2 VISTA REAL DRIVE, ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, CA 90274

6/26/2018: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP ? 405.2] PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2 VISTA REAL DRIVE, ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, CA 90274

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/16/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL YU

5/24/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF SAMUEL YU

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION AND COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI

5/24/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION AND COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION AND COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KIL SOOK CHOI

5/24/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION AND COLLECTION CORPORATION'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KIL SOOK CHOI

Minute Order

5/10/2018: Minute Order

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

5/9/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION AND COLLECTION CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

4/27/2018: PLAINTIFF KOREA RESOLUTION AND COLLECTION CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/17/2018: REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF YARON SHAHAM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/13/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF YARON SHAHAM IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF JEA UN CHOI AND KIL SOOK CHOI, HUSBAND AND WIFE IN SUPPORT T

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUMMONS AND SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF JEA UN CHOI AND KIL SOOK CHOI, HUSBAND AND WIFE IN SUPPORT T

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION DISMISS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF JEA UN CHOI AND KIL SOOK CHOI, HUSBAND AND WIFE, IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/4/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION DISMISS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES AND DECLARATIONS OF JEA UN CHOI AND KIL SOOK CHOI, HUSBAND AND WIFE, IN SUPPORT THEREOF

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/7/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2]-PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2 VISTA REAL DRIVE, ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, CA 9O274

3/7/2018: NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2]-PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2 VISTA REAL DRIVE, ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, CA 9O274

SUMMONS

2/9/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT (CAL CIV. CODE 17131; ETC

2/9/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT (CAL CIV. CODE 17131; ETC

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; (Motion to Compel; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • at 08:45 AM in Department 14; (Motion to Compel; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP 405.2] PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2 VISTA REAL DRIVE, ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, CA 90274

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO CONWEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JEA UN CHOI OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • NOTICE OF TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT KIL SOOK CHOI OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • Motion to Quash; Filed by Jea Un Choi (Defendant); Kil Sook Choi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [CCP SECTION 405.2]-PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2 VISTA REAL DRIVE, ROLLING HILLS ESTATES, CA 9O274

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT (CAL CIV. CODE 17131; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

02/09/18 03:06PM PST KAHANA ° 1, P.C. -> LA - Stanley Moc¢™ “ourthou 14422473751 Pg 3/4 0 .

3 7 4in oL,y

Ped pree>

™ o0

W 6o <~e

Amir M. Kahana, Esq. (SBN 218149)

Samuel Yu, Esq. (SBN 251636) Mimi Ahn, Esq. (SBN 301035)

KAHANA & FELD LLP

3 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 685 Santa Ana, CA 92707

Telephone (949) 812-4781 Facsimile (949) 281-2105

E-mail: akahana@kahanafeld com,

syu@kahanafeld.com; mahn@kahanafeld.com

Attorneys for Plaintiff Korea Resolution & Collection Corporation

Superior Court of California County of Los Angeles

FEB 09 2018

icer/Clerk (i B, Carter, E cer S!: w Depuly y Ricardo Perez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES KOREA RESOLUTION & COLLECTION

CORPORATION, a Korean corporation,

Plaintiff

JEA UN CHOI, an individual also known as

Case No.: Q69§339

COMPLAINT FOR:

(1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN

MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CIV. CODE § 1713];

(2) FRAUDULENT TRANSFER; AND

(3) CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUDULENT

JAE EUN CHO], also known as JEAUN TRANSFER CHOI, also known as JAE U. CHOL KIL SOOK CHOI, an individual also known as KIL SOOK HWANG; and DOES 1to 50, | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL inclusive,

Defendants.

Yoo ‘4