This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2019 at 10:02:44 (UTC).

KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION ET AL VS KOAN HYUN CHO E

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against KOAN HYUN CHO E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3674

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MIRAE MUTUAL SAVINGS BACK CO. LTD

KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

CHOSUN ARTIST INC.

CHO KOAN HYUN AKA KEUN HYUN CHO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAHANA AMIR MOSHE ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

LEE YONG BOM BOM ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

8/29/2019: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS) OF 08/28/2019

8/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS) OF 08/28/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS)

8/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS)

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

7/25/2019: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

7/25/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice of Ruling

6/3/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order - ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

6/3/2019: Order - ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; STATUS CONFERENCE R...)

6/3/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS; STATUS CONFERENCE R...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/21/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens) of 03/04/2019

3/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens) of 03/04/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens)

3/4/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens)

Declaration - Declaration OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

2/28/2019: Declaration - Declaration OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY

Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES

2/19/2019: Opposition - Opposition PLAINTIFF KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS AND REQUEST FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFF KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS

2/19/2019: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice PLAINTIFF KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATIONS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS

Supplemental Declaration - Supplemental Declaration OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

2/22/2019: Supplemental Declaration - Supplemental Declaration OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

Reply - Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

2/22/2019: Reply - Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS

Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

1/15/2019: Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

Declaration - Declaration of Koan Hyun Cho

1/15/2019: Declaration - Declaration of Koan Hyun Cho

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2020
  • Hearing01/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Korea Deposit Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens - Held - Motion Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens) of 08/28/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (OF KOAN HYUN CHO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXPUNGE LIS PENDENS); Filed by Koan Hyun Cho (Defendant); Chosun Artist, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Koan Hyun Cho (Defendant); Chosun Artist, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (Re Appeal) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketOrder (continuing hearing); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Korea Deposit Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff); Mirae Mutual Savings Back, Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Korea Deposit Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff); Mirae Mutual Savings Back, Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION (CCP SECTION 405.21 - PROPERTY LOCATED AT 1585 SUNSET PLAZA DRIVE, LOS ANGELES, CA 90069

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Korea Deposit Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff); Mirae Mutual Savings Back, Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CIV. PROC. CODE 17131; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

04/27/18 01:33PM PDT KAHANA LAW, P.C. -> LA - Stanley Mosk Courthou 14422473751 Pg- 3/2

9 SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 10 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

!l KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CaseNo: BCT08R87 4

12 CORPORATION, a Korean corporation as Trustee of the Bankrupt MIRAE MUTUAL 8?%1111\1('31‘;1?\/(])]?“ OF FOREIGN 13 || SAVINGS BACK, €O, LID, MONEY JUDGMENT [CAL. CIV.

14 - PROC. CODE § 1713]; Plaintiff, (2) FRAUDULENT TRANSFER; AND

15 (3) CONSTRUCTIVE FRAUDULENT

v. TRANSFER

16 || KOAN HYUN CHO, an individual, also

known as KEUN HYUN CHO,; CHOSUN 17 ARTIST, INC., a California corporation; and DOES 1-50, inclusive,

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

18 19 Defendants. 20 21 22 23 L?o':v 24 o 25

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOREA DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION is a litigant