This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 12:46:08 (UTC).

KOOK BONG LEE, ET AL. VS NATHANAEL YUN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 KOOK BONG LEE filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against NATHANAEL YUN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL L. STERN and MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6339

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL L. STERN

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEE JASON AN INDIVIDUAL

PARK GENCHUN AN INDIVIDUAL

LEE KOOK BONG AN INDIVIDUAL

HWANG CHRIS AN INDIVIDUAL AKA SEUNG WOOK HWANG

KIM YONG KI AN INDIVIDUAL

HWANG JI TAMMY AN INDIVIDUAL

KIM JOYCE AN INDIVIDUAL

CHO KI OK AN INDIVIDUAL

PARK TONY AN INDIVIDUAL

SEO GEON OH AN INDIVIDUAL

LEE JASON

Defendants

PARK HUN SUNG AN INDIVIDUAL

KIM SAMUEL S. AN INDIVIDUAL

JIN SUK HO AN INDIVIDUAL

KO JOO MO AN INDIVIDUAL

LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION

YUN NATHANAEL AN INDIVIDUAL

KOREAN WESTERN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH FOUNDATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION

KIM BONG K. AN INDIVIDUAL

KOREAN WESTERN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF LOS ANGELES A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT RELIGIOUS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIM DAVID S

KIM DAVID S.

Other Attorneys

LEE W. DAN

SOHN CARL JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/17/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/11/2019: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/10/2019: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/10/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Related Case

11/7/2019: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS KOREAN WESTERN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF LOS ANGELES, BONG K. KIM AND JOO MO KO

11/6/2019: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANTS KOREAN WESTERN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF LOS ANGELES, BONG K. KIM AND JOO MO KO

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL A. DE LORIMIER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS HUNG SUNG PARK AND LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH RE: THIRTY DAY EXTENSION TO APPEAR PER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430

11/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PAUL A. DE LORIMIER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS HUNG SUNG PARK AND LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH RE: THIRTY DAY EXTENSION TO APPEAR PER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 430

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

11/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/15/2019

11/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES) OF 11/15/2019

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

12/5/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/04/2019

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 12/04/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Related Case

12/4/2019: Notice of Related Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • Hearing01/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Hearing01/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by Nathanael Yun (Defendant); Samuel S. Kim (Defendant); Suk Ho Jin (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 2:59 PM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 12/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Korean Western Presbyterian Church of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( of Paul A. de Lorimier on Behalf of Defendants Hung Sung Park and LA Open Door Presbyterian Church Re: Thirty Day Extension to Appear Per Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2)); Filed by Hun Sung Park (Defendant); La Open Door Presbyterian Church (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 4:10 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re Notice of Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re Notice of Related Cases) of 11/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Korean Western Presbyterian Church of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Appearance ( FOR DEFENDANTS KOREAN WESTERN PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF LOS ANGELES, BONG K. KIM AND JOO MO KO); Filed by Bong K. Kim (Defendant); Joo Mo Ko (Defendant); Korean Western Presbyterian Church of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Kook Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Jason Lee (Plaintiff); Ji Tammy Hwang (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Kook Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Jason Lee (Plaintiff); Ji Tammy Hwang (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kook Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Jason Lee (Plaintiff); Ji Tammy Hwang (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kook Bong Lee (Plaintiff); Jason Lee (Plaintiff); Ji Tammy Hwang (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LA OPEN DOOR PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH A DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE W. DAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOHN CARL J. LAW OFFICES OF