This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2022 at 14:06:11 (UTC).

KOO SHENGCHENG VS SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 KOO SHENGCHENG filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5412

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOO SHENG CHENG

Defendants

AHMC HEALTHCARE INC.

SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER

AHMC SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RITHOLZ ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

8/5/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

8/5/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/5/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

8/5/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/10/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/11/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

11/30/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Case Management Statement

12/1/2022: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sheng Cheng Koo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KOO SHENGCHENG (Plaintiff); As to: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); AHMC Healthcare Inc. (Defendant); AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by: KOO SHENGCHENG (Plaintiff); As to: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); AHMC Healthcare Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 01/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KOO SHENGCHENG (Plaintiff); As to: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); AHMC Healthcare Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KOO SHENGCHENG (Plaintiff); As to: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); AHMC Healthcare Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KOO SHENGCHENG (Plaintiff); As to: SAN GABRIEL VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant); AHMC Healthcare Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AHMC San Gabriel Valley Medical Center LP, 14cv1477, doing business as San Gabriel Valley Medical Center is a litigant