This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 02:47:50 (UTC).

KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC , A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4829

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DR. ALLEN LU

WEISSMAN SCOTT

SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

MOSS AARON J.

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BOWSE MICHAEL

MOSS AARON J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BOWSE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Case Management Order

5/25/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Related Case

3/24/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Related Case

3/5/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/16/2021

3/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/16/2021

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/2/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

3/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

1/22/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...)

1/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERV...)

Answer

1/26/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

12/24/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

12/24/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

11/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/25/2020: Proof of Personal Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2022
  • Hearing05/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Hearing05/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS (Defendant); DR. ALLEN LU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS (Defendant); DR. ALLEN LU (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF SCHEDULING OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KONTAKT INTERNATIONAL, INC., a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCOSI ORTHOPEDICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSS AARON J.