This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 18:38:12 (UTC).

KOMALTA JESRANI VS SKECHERS U.S.A., INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 KOMALTA JESRANI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SKECHERS U S A , INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE G. IWASAKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3538

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE G. IWASAKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESRANI KOMALTA

Defendants

PANCHAL ASHWAT

RODRIGUEZ JOHNNY

SKECHERS U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SETYAN SAMVEL

Defendant Attorney

HAMILTON MELANIE M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/26/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

7/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

Case Management Statement

7/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/11/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/8/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

5/2/2023: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/26/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/23/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

2/17/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

2/17/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

2/17/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

05/19/2025

Hearing05/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/13/2025

Hearing05/13/2025 at 09:00 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2024

Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/13/2025 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 05/19/2025 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Komalta Jesrani (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 updated: Result Date to 07/26/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 58 updated: Result Date to 07/26/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
02/23/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Komalta Jesrani (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant); Johnny Rodriguez (Defendant); Ashwat Panchal (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Komalta Jesrani (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant); Johnny Rodriguez (Defendant); Ashwat Panchal (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Komalta Jesrani (Plaintiff); As to: Skechers U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant); Johnny Rodriguez (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Bruce G. Iwasaki in Department 58 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less