This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 01:30:31 (UTC).

KOLODNY & ANTEAU VS FARIBA COHEN

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 KOLODNY ANTEAU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FARIBA COHEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and MARC MARMARO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0942

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

MARC MARMARO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KOLODNY & ANTEAU

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

COHEN FARIBA

Cross Defendants

KOLODNY STEPHEN A.

ANTEAU RONALD W.

KOLODNY LAW GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MATTHAI EDITH R. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

THE LEICHTER FIRM APC

Cross Defendant Attorney

JACKSON GABRIELLE M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/13/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/1/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

12/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/4/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT FARIBA COHEN'S NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

3/27/2018: DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT FARIBA COHEN'S NOTICE OF HEARING DATE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Unknown

4/9/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/9/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

4/24/2018: Minute Order

ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS KOLODNY & ANTEAU, A PARTNERSHIP OF PROFESSIONAL CORPORATIONS AND STEPHEN A. KOLODNY, APC TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: ANSWER OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS KOLODNY & ANTEAU, A PARTNERSHIP OF PROFESSIONAL CORPORATIONS AND STEPHEN A. KOLODNY, APC TO DEFENDANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

CROSS-DEFENDANT KOLODNY LAW GROUP'S DEMURRER TO FARIBA COHEN'S CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MARTA A. ALCUMBRAC

5/4/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT KOLODNY LAW GROUP'S DEMURRER TO FARIBA COHEN'S CROSS-COMPLAINT; DECLARATION OF MARTA A. ALCUMBRAC

CROSS-DEFENDANT KOLODNY LAW GROUP'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FARIBA COHEN'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

5/4/2018: CROSS-DEFENDANT KOLODNY LAW GROUP'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO FARIBA COHEN'S CROSS-COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/8/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

5/8/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/31/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

Minute Order

6/6/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

6/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. BC670942 WITH CASE NO. BC644632; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. LEICHTER

8/1/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. BC670942 WITH CASE NO. BC644632; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. LEICHTER

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Court Order (Court Order; Court makes order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION OF CASE NO. BC670942 WITH CASE NO. BC644632; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF KEVIN J. LEICHTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE RESCHEDULING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Fariba Cohen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • DECLARATION OF GABRIELLE M. JACKSON IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • OSC-RE Other (Miscellaneous); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • ORDIR TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • KOLODNY & ANTEAU'S COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Kolodny & Anteau (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • at 08:29 AM in Department 52; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOLODNY & ANTEAU is a litigant

Latest cases where KOLODNY LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACKSON GABRIELLE M. ESQ.