This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2022 at 09:58:57 (UTC).

KOKKINOS, KASSIANI VS KOKKINOS, JIANOULA

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 KOKKINOS, KASSIANI filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against KOKKINOS, JIANOULA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AHARONOV, AMIR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0524

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AHARONOV, AMIR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KOKKINOS KASSIANI

Respondent

KOKKINOS JIANOULA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

4/1/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/1/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

4/1/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - GRANTED

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/1/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

4/1/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Minute Order

4/26/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/26/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

5/17/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/17/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

6/7/2022: Minute Order

Request - Dismissal

6/3/2022: Request - Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F50, Aharonov, Amir, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (GRANTED ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNAUSS JOANNE MIRRAS