This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 04:10:00 (UTC).

KNIGHT, JOHN ARTHUR - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 KNIGHT, JOHN ARTHUR - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9161

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KNIGHT JAMES E.

Decedent

KNIGHT JOHN ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

9/21/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

9/20/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

9/22/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate - Notice of Petition to Administer Estate

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

10/1/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Order - Probate

11/19/2021: Order - Probate

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

11/19/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Minute Order

11/9/2021: Minute Order

Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration

11/5/2021: Supplement - Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration

Supplement - Second Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration

11/5/2021: Supplement - Second Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration

Letters (Initial)

11/19/2021: Letters (Initial)

Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors

4/19/2022: Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice - Administration to Creditors

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 11 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketNotice - Administration to Creditors (Notice - Administration to Creditors ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 11, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketSupplement (Second Supplement to Petition for Letters of Administration ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate (Notice of Petition to Administer Estate ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNE JOHN MICHAEL