This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/13/2022 at 06:05:48 (UTC).

KITTY ROURKE VS RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 KITTY ROURKE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7011

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROURKE KITTY

Defendant

RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAVAHERIAN SEYMONE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/27/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/6/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/6/2022: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2024
  • Hearing12/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • Hearing06/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kitty Rourke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kitty Rourke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kitty Rourke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kitty Rourke (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant