This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/08/2022 at 07:41:52 (UTC).

KITCHAIYA, WICHARN VS KITCHAIYA, PATTARAWADEE

Case Summary

On 11/03/2021 KITCHAIYA, WICHARN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against KITCHAIYA, PATTARAWADEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARTELLA, TIMOTHY and WILCOX, WENDY L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1207

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARTELLA, TIMOTHY

WILCOX, WENDY L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KITCHAIYA WICHARN

Respondent

KITCHAIYA PATTARAWADEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Respondent Attorney

REYES KENNETH URSUA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

4/20/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Order to participate in media tion

11/12/2021: Proof of Service - Order to participate in media tion

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

11/24/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

11/24/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

1/24/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/7/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Minute Order

1/7/2022: Minute Order

Certificate of Completion

12/22/2021: Certificate of Completion

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

11/3/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/3/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service

11/12/2021: Proof of Service

FCS-Mediation Memo

11/18/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

11/22/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

11/23/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order

11/24/2021: Minute Order

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 81, Wilcox, Wendy L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 81, Wilcox, Wendy L., Presiding; Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (Notice of Related Case ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Completion; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S, Martella, Timothy, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Substitution of Attorney ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Order to participate in media tion ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE