This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 19:45:31 (UTC).

KIRKPATRICK BRANFORD VS FU LU SONG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 KIRKPATRICK BRANFORD filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FU LU SONG,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9988

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANFORD KIRKPATRICK

Defendants

JIN YUN CORP.

SONG FU LU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILMAN JEFFREY

Defendant Attorney

MANCINI ANDREW MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Application - APPLICATION VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JACK NUGENT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF

2/7/2023: Application - APPLICATION VERIFIED APPLICATION OF JACK NUGENT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. MILMAN, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

2/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. MILMAN, ESQ., IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF JACK NUGENT

2/7/2023: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - APPLICATION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE OF JACK NUGENT

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

1/23/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/20/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/20/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/10/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Answer

10/3/2022: Answer

Notice of Ruling

7/15/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS)

7/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS)

6/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS) OF 06/09/2022

6/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS) OF 06/09/2022

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

6/16/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

6/17/2022: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW MANCINI ISO MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

6/23/2022: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ANDREW MANCINI ISO MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS 06 09 22

6/1/2022: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS 06 09 22

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/26/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. MILMAN

5/26/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS; DECLARATION OF JEFFREY A. MILMAN

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2024
  • Hearing08/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • Hearing08/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2023
  • Hearing07/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketApplication to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff); As to: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketApplication Verified Application of Jack Nugent to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiff; Filed by: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff); As to: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Jeffrey A. Milman, Esq., in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice OF JACK NUGENT: Name Extension: OF JACK NUGENT ; As To Parties changed from Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff) to Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Fu Lu Song (Defendant); Jin Yun Corp. (Defendant); As to: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff); As to: Fu Lu Song (Defendant); Jin Yun Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff); As to: Fu Lu Song (Defendant); Jin Yun Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kirkpatrick Branford (Plaintiff); As to: Fu Lu Song (Defendant); Jin Yun Corp. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******9988 Hearing Date: July 13, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

Defendants Fu Lu Song and Jin Yun Corp.’s motion for forum non conveniens is DENIED.

Objections

Plaintiff’s Objections to Defendants Evidence:

Objections 1-6 are SUSTAINED.

Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 410.30 states, in relevant part: “(a) When a court upon motion of a party of its own motion finds that in the interest of substantial justice an action should be heard in a forum outside this state, the court shall stay or dismiss the action in whole or in part on any conditions that may be just.”

Code of Civil Procedure section 418.10 states, in relevant part: “(a) A defendant, on or before the last day of his or her time to plead or within any further time that the court may for good cause allow, may serve and file a notice of motion for one of more of the following purposes: . . . (2) to stay or dismiss the action on the ground of inconvenient forum.”

Code of Civil Procedure section 418.10, subdivision (b)’s codification of “[f]orum non conveniens is an equitable doctrine invoking the discretionary power of a court to decline to exercise the jurisdiction it has over a transitory cause of action when it believes that the action may be more appropriately and justly tried elsewhere.” (Stangvik v. Shiley Inc. (1991) 54 Cal.3d 744, 751.)

The first part of the analysis in determining whether an action should be dismissed due to being filed in an inconvenient forum is whether a suitable alternative forum exists. (See Stangvik, supra, 54 Cal.3d 744, 752; National Football League v. Fireman’s Fund Ins. Co. (2013) 216 Cal.App.4th 902, 918.) A suitable alternative forum exists when the “. . . defendants are subject to the court’s jurisdiction and the cause of action is not barred by the statute of limitations.” (Guimei v. General Electric Co. (2009) 172 Cal.App.4th 689, 694.)

The second part of the analysis is the weighing and balancing of private and public factors. (National Football League, supra, 216, Cal.App.4th at p. 918.) “The private interest facts are those that make trial and the enforceability of the ensuring judgment expeditious and relatively inexpensive, such as the ease of access to sources of proof, the cost of obtaining attendance of witnesses, and the availability of compulsory process for attendance of unwilling witnesses. The public interest facts include avoidance of overburdening local courts with congested calendars, protecting the interest of potential jurors so that they are not called upon to decide cases in which the local community has little concern, and the weighing of competing interests of California and the alternative jurisdiction in the litigation.” (Morris v. AGFA Corp. (2006) 144 Cal.App.4th 1452, 1463-1464.)

The party seeking a dismissal due to an inconvenient forum bears the burden of proof. (National Football League v. Fireman’s Fund Ins. Co. (2013) 216 Cal.App.4th 902, 926.)

Discussion

Suitable Alternative Forum

Defendants argue Arizona is a suitable alternative forum. The collision that underlies Plaintiff’s action took place in Navajo County, Arizona. (Complaint, pg. 4.) The statute of limitations in Arizona is two years. (Arizona Revised Statutes section 12-542.) Further, the incident occurred on September 5, 2020, a little under two months shy of the two-year mark. (Complaint, pg. 4.)

Balancing of Interests – Private Interests

Plaintiff is a California resident. (Opposition, pg. 2:8.) Defendant Jin Yun Corp. is a California corporation with a primary place of business in Los Angeles County. (Id., pg. 2:9.) Plaintiff argues that all witnesses presently on the record, with the exception of the investigating officer, do not favor Arizona as a convenient forum. (Opposition, pg. 2:12-13.) Defendants attempt to submit evidence that Plaintiff sought medical treatment in Arizona, and that Plaintiff is not a California resident any longer, but rather a resident of Oklahoma. (Mancini Decl., Exhs. B-C.) However, exhibit B has not been authenticated, and exhibit C is hearsay, and the public records exception is not applicable as a LexisNexis Person Search Results Report is not a record made in the normal course of business by someone with first-hand knowledge. Therefore, this evidence is inadmissible.

The Court finds the private interests do not show that the forum is inconvenient in California. Plaintiff argues that he is a resident of California, and it is undisputed that Defendant is a California corporation. However, even if Defendants’ evidence was admissible, and Plaintiff sought treatment in Arizona, and lives in Oklahoma, Defendants would still not have met their burden to show California is an inconvenient forum. First, whether Plaintiff lives in Oklahoma does little to benefit Defendants’ position, because the Court is considering whether California is inconvenient compared to Arizona. Although it helps Defendants’ position in that it prevents this factor from tipping in favor of Plaintiff’s favor, it does not help Defendants’ argument otherwise. While Plaintiff’s treatment in Arizona would be helpful to Defendants if admissible, the private interests would still only be neutral in showing that California is an inconvenient forum.

Balancing of Interests – Public Interests

Defendants also argue Arizona is a more convenient forum because the collision occurred in Arizona. Further, Defendants argue that California has crowded court calendars and congested courts and it would be inequitable to impose the obligation of jury duty on a forum having little to no interest in the litigation. (Motion, pg. 5:26-27.) Defendants also argue the cost to California taxpayers for a trial in which the forum has no interest is unwarranted. (Motion, pg. 5:21-22.) However, Defendants do not recognize the interest California jurors have in deciding liability and damages issues that relates to a defendant who has its primary place of business in California. Thus, the public interests are also neutral in showing that California is an inconvenient forum.

Conclusion

Accordingly, Defendants have not met their burden to establish that California is an inconvenient forum. The motion is therefore DENIED.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.



Case Number: *******9988 Hearing Date: June 9, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVE

Defendant Jin Yun Corp.’s motion for forum non conveniens is DENIED.

Legal Standard

“Forum non conveniens is an equitable doctrine invoking the discretionary power of a court to decline to exercise the jurisdiction it has over a transitory cause of action when it believes that the action may be more appropriately and justly tried elsewhere.” (Stangvik v. Shiley, Inc. (1991) 54 Cal.3d 744, 751.)

CCP section 410.30(a) provides, as follows: “[w]hen a court upon motion of a party or its own motion finds that in the interest of substantial justice an action should be heard in a forum outside this state, the court shall stay or dismiss the action in whole or in part on any conditions that may be just.”

Plaintiff's choice of forum will not be disturbed unless the court is convinced that: (1) a “suitable” alternative forum exists; and (2) the balance of private and public interest factors makes it “just” that the litigation proceed in the alternative forum. (Stangvik, supra, 54 Cal.3d at p. 752.)

On a motion for forum non conveniens, the defendant, as the moving party, bears the burden of proof. (Stangvik, supra, 54 Cal.3d at 751-752.) The granting or denial of such a motion is within the trial court's discretion, and substantial deference is accorded its determination in this regard. (Id.)

Discussion

Defendant argues that Arizona provides a suitable place for trial and that the forum is inconvenient in Los Angeles because the collision occurred in Arizona and all witnesses are readily available in Arizona.

Plaintiff contends in opposition that Plaintiff is a California resident, and Defendant is a California corporation with a primary place of business in Los Angeles County. In addition, Plaintiff argues that Defendant has failed to make any showing that Los Angeles is a seriously inconvenient forum to any non-party witness to testify.

Here, Defendant failed to meet the burden of showing that forum is inconvenient in Los Angeles County. Defendant has failed to provide any evidence in support of its Motion to show that it would be inconvenient for the witnesses of this case to travel to Los Angeles County or that it would be inconvenient to bring physical evidence to Los Angeles County. As such, Defendant failed to meet its burden that Los Angeles County is an inconvenient forum.

Conclusion

Based on the foregoing, Defendant’s motion is DENIED.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.