This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 01:05:56 (UTC).

KIRK ALEXANDER JACKSON VS JOSEPH SARKISSIAN DDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by KIRK ALEXANDER JACKSON against JOSEPH SARKISSIAN DDS in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1690

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

JACKSON KIRK ALEXANDER

Respondents and Defendants

SARKISSIAN JOSEPH

DOES 1 TO 20

JOSEPH SARKISSIAN DDS INC

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/16/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF HEARING OFF CALENDAR

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN D.D.S. TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO ITS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; DECLARATION OF ALDWIN TANALA AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIO

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN D.D.S. TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO ITS SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; DECLARATION OF ALDWIN TANALA AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIO

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN D.D.S. TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; DECLARATION OF ALD WIN TANALA AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN D.D.S. TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO ITS FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE; DECLARATION OF ALD WIN TANALA AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED;AND ETC.

7/24/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED;AND ETC.

DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN, D.D.S.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS

8/17/2018: DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN, D.D.S.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS

Notice of Motion

1/16/2019: Notice of Motion

Opposition

1/28/2019: Opposition

Opposition

2/14/2019: Opposition

Minute Order

2/28/2019: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5/2/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Proof of Service

4/23/2018: Proof of Service

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

4/23/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

4/23/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

4/11/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

4/11/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Opposition (Substantive Opposition to Plaintiff's Rescheduled Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Records or Protective Order and Request for Order Awarding Monetary Sanctions; Declaration of Steven J. Renick); Filed by Joseph Sarkissian (Defendant); Joseph Sarkissian, DDS, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Deposirtion Subpoenas for Production of Records or Protective Order) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Opposition (Opposition and Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Records or Protective Order and Request for Order Awarding Monetary Sanctions, on the Ground That the Plaintiff Failed to Give Timely Notice of the Motion; Dec); Filed by Joseph Sarkissian (Defendant); Joseph Sarkissian, DDS, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoenas for Production of Records or Protective Order and Request for Order Awarding Monetary Sanctions Under C.C.P. section 2023.030 Against Defendant Joseph Sarkissian, D.D.S. in the; Filed by Kirk Alexander Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3; Hearing on Motion to Compel ((Off Calendar)) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-31 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DEFENDANT JOSEPH SARKISSIAN, D.D.S.'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO COMPEL RESPONSES FROM PLAINTIFF AND REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Joseph Sarkissian (Defendant); Joseph Sarkissian, DDS, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Kirk Alexander Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Kirk Alexander Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Kirk Alexander Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Kirk Alexander Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Kirk Alexander Jackson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701690    Hearing Date: November 01, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

KIRK ALEXANDER JACKSON,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

JOSEPH SARKISSIAN, D.D.S., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC701690

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 1, 2019

Andrew J. Nissen seeks to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiff. The Court will grant the motion if Counsel appears and articulates his reasons for withdrawal, in camera if necessary, at the hearing. While an attorney need not disclose the exact reasons for withdrawal in his motion to be relieved, some general basis must be disclosed. Counsel, in his moving declaration, did not disclose even the very general basis for the relief sought.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.