This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2021 at 17:14:27 (UTC).

KINGTREE AVENUE LLC VS CRENSHAW, KIM LAVON

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 KINGTREE AVENUE LLC filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against CRENSHAW, KIM LAVON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SKEBA, VALERIE L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1381

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SKEBA, VALERIE L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KINGTREE AVENUE LLC

Respondent

CRENSHAW KIM LAVON

Other

POOLE DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FOUNTAIN RIKKA J

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

12/21/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Response - Workplace Violence

12/18/2020: Response - Workplace Violence

Minute Order

12/21/2020: Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Workplace Violence

11/25/2020: Petition - Workplace Violence

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

11/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

11/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given)

Declaration - of Daniel Pool in Support of Restraining Order

11/25/2020: Declaration - of Daniel Pool in Support of Restraining Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Proof of Service

12/2/2020: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketResponse - Workplace Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Daniel Pool in Support of Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less