Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2020 at 09:31:46 (UTC).

KING, TINA MARIE VS KING, CHRISTOPHER JOSEF

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 KING, TINA MARIE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against KING, CHRISTOPHER JOSEF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHORT, MICHELLE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0651

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHORT, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KING TINA MARIE

Respondent

KING CHRISTOPHER JOSEF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

OLIVER APRIL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service - DV109, DV110, DV120

6/16/2020: Proof of Service - DV109, DV110, DV120

Minute Order

6/23/2020: Minute Order

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/3/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

6/3/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

6/3/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

6/3/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted/Partly Denied

6/3/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted/Partly Denied

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department F48, Short, Michelle, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketRemoved from Active Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (DV109, DV110, DV120 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted/Partly Denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OLIVER APRIL