This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/19/2021 at 14:46:42 (UTC).

KING, TANYA VS KING, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 KING, TANYA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KING, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0047

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KING TANYA

Respondent

KING TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons - served on 1/19/21

1/28/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - served on 1/19/21

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/15/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/15/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/15/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Summons

1/15/2021: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

1/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/15/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (served on 1/19/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less