This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/11/2020 at 22:45:49 (UTC).

KING, PETRINA VS KING, JOEY

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 KING, PETRINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KING, JOEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2227

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Whittier Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KING PETRINA

Respondent

KING JOEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Proof of Service of Summons (Amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • Notice - Rejection (Re: POS of Summons received 12/27/19 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Declaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Notice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Declaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.