This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 08:20:30 (UTC).

KIMBERLY VILLEGAS VS JOHN SCHOENI

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 KIMBERLY VILLEGAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN SCHOENI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0231

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLEGAS KIMBERLY

Defendant

SCHOENI JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDEZ GIANCARLO J.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/1/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION DUE DILIGENCE

4/10/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DUE DILIGENCE

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

4/10/2023: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

4/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X updated: Result Date to 04/12/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by: Kimberly Villegas (Plaintiff); As to: John Schoeni (Defendant); Mailing Date: 04/06/2023; Service Cost: 155.00; Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDeclaration Due Diligence; Filed by: Kimberly Villegas (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Declaration Due Diligence: As To Parties: John Schoeni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kimberly Villegas (Plaintiff); As to: John Schoeni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kimberly Villegas (Plaintiff); As to: John Schoeni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kimberly Villegas (Plaintiff); As to: John Schoeni (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department X Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less