This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2022 at 16:17:41 (UTC).

KIMBERLY MOSELEY VS RANDSTAD INHOUSE SERVICES, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 KIMBERLY MOSELEY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against RANDSTAD INHOUSE SERVICES, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1135

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOSELEY KIMBERLY

Defendants

FN LOGISTICS INC. DBA FASHION NOVA A DELAWARE CORPORATION

RANDSTAD INHOUSE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRADLEY MARCUS JOSEPH

MAJARIAN SAHAG II

Defendant Attorneys

MACGREGOR ELIZABETH J.

WHANG DANIEL C.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINA...)

9/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINA...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINA...) OF 09/17/2021

9/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINA...) OF 09/17/2021

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 18 HEARING TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M. VIA E-MAIL

6/17/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF JUNE 18 HEARING TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M. VIA E-MAIL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (JOINT) - TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/23/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (JOINT) - TO VACATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF MEDIATION)

12/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF MEDIATION)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9/9/2020: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Appearance

8/14/2020: Notice of Appearance

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 07/08/2020

7/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 07/08/2020

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: JULY 8, 2020 MINUTE ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

7/23/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: JULY 8, 2020 MINUTE ORDER RE: INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6/5/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 09/28/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 updated: Result Date to 09/28/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 09/28/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Motion for Prelimina...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Motion for Prelimina...) of 09/17/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Motion for Preliminary Approval scheduled for 09/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 updated: Result Date to 09/17/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance of June 18 hearing to September 17, 2021 at 9:00 a.m. via e-mail; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review re: Status of Motion for Preliminary Approval scheduled for 06/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/17/2021 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Joint) - to Vacate Case Management Conference; Signed and Filed by: Randstad Inhouse Services, LLC (Defendant); FN Logistics Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Initial Status Conference) of 07/08/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: Kimberly Moseley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Highberger in Department 10 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kimberly Moseley (Plaintiff); As to: Randstad Inhouse Services, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kimberly Moseley (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Pleadings: Status Date changed from 06/05/2020 to 05/29/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FN LOGISTICS INC. DBA FASHION NOVA A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Randstad Inhouse Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY MARCUS J.