This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 13:19:09 (UTC).

KIMBERLY MAJOR VS 507 BROAD AVE, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 KIMBERLY MAJOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 507 BROAD AVE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0076

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAJOR KIMBERLY

Defendants

INFINITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC.

507 BROAD AVE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIELSEN TANNER R.

Defendant Attorney

KENNICK SHELBY

 

Court Documents

Answer

8/25/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/11/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • Hearing10/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 49 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 507 Broad Ave, LLC (Defendant); Infinity Property Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kimberly Major (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kimberly Major (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kimberly Major (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant