This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 17:45:42 (UTC).

KIMBERLY LANE VS CITY OF CERRITOS

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 KIMBERLY LANE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CITY OF CERRITOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3087

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANE KIMBERLY

Defendant

CITY OF CERRITOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA LEMUEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/8/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

10/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

10/8/2021: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2024
  • Hearing09/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • Hearing03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kimberly Lane (Plaintiff); As to: City of Cerritos (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kimberly Lane (Plaintiff); As to: City of Cerritos (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF CERRITOS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA LEMUEL L.