Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2021 at 15:30:21 (UTC).

KIMBERLY JONES VS AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 KIMBERLY JONES filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9666

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JONES KIMBERLY

Defendant

AMERICAN AIRLINES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASADI ALEX

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/25/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

5/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2024
  • Hearing05/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Hearing11/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Hearing11/08/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kimberly Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kimberly Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kimberly Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant