This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/30/2023 at 06:45:39 (UTC).

KIMBERLY EDWARDS, ET AL. VS MARIA DIAZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 KIMBERLY EDWARDS, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARIA DIAZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2145

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARDS KIMBERLY

Defendants

DIAZ MARIA

MARTINEZ ELVIN FRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OSTOIA ADINA A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

2/1/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/1/2023: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

2/1/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/1/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/1/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ROBYN

2/9/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR ROBYN

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/6/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2025
  • Hearing01/29/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2024
  • Hearing07/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2024
  • Hearing07/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Diaz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/13/2023; Service Cost: 140.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Elvin Fred Martinez (Defendant); Service Date: 03/09/2023; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Diaz (Defendant); Elvin Fred Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Robyn; Signed and Filed by: Kimberly Edwards (Plaintiff); Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Robyn Ross (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Robyn: Filed By: Kimberly Edwards (Plaintiff),Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 07/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/31/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/29/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kimberly Edwards (Plaintiff); Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Diaz (Defendant); Elvin Fred Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kimberly Edwards (Plaintiff); Robyn Ross (Plaintiff); As to: Maria Diaz (Defendant); Elvin Fred Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less