This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2019 at 02:17:35 (UTC).

KIMBERLY CURTIS, ET AL VS JOHN SINGH RANDHAWA, ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 KIMBERLY CURTIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN SINGH RANDHAWA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7210

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CUSTIS KIMBERLY

CUSTID KYLE

HALL KIMBERLY

CURTIS KIMBERLY

CURTIS KYLE

Defendants

RANDHAWA DARSHAN

RANDHAWA RAVINDER

RANDHAW JOHN SING

RANDHAWA JOHN SING

Guardian Ad Litem

CURTIS KIMBERLY AKA HALL KIMBERLY

Minors

CUSTIS KENDALL

CURTIS KENDALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor and Plaintiff Attorneys

TOWNSLEY CHRISTOPHER B. ESQ.

TOWNSLEY CHRISTOPHER BRUCE ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ROSSER DAVID R. ESQ.

JOACHIM LINDSAY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC

7/16/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FSC

Unknown

9/24/2018: Unknown

Unknown

9/24/2018: Unknown

Ex Parte Application

10/15/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/4/2019: Minute Order

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

6/28/2017: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. EMOTIONAL DISTRESS- DIRECT VICTIMS

6/28/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. EMOTIONAL DISTRESS- DIRECT VICTIMS

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

7/5/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

SUMMONS

7/5/2017: SUMMONS

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT- UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

7/5/2017: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT- UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/20/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/21/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Unknown

8/22/2017: Unknown

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

8/22/2017: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

DEMAND FOR JURY

8/22/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY

Unknown

5/21/2018: Unknown

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Failure to Complete Private Medation) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions for Failure to Complete Pri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Failure to Complete Private Medation) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: San...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by John Sing Randhawa (Defendant); Darshan Randhawa (Defendant); Ravinder Randhawa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Kimberly Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT- UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL- 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. EMOTIONAL DISTRESS- DIRECT VICTIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Kimberly Curtis (Plaintiff); Kyle Curtis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • SECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT PROCEDURES, NORTH DISTRICT

    Read MoreRead Less