This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2023 at 04:23:53 (UTC).

KIMBERLY CANTOR VS PATRICIA CHACOPULOS, TRUSTEE OF THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST UNDER THE GEORGE CHACOPULOS TRUST AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BYPASS TRUST UND

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 KIMBERLY CANTOR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PATRICIA CHACOPULOS, TRUSTEE OF THE SURVIVOR'S TRUST UNDER THE GEORGE CHACOPULOS TRUST AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE BYPASS TRUST UND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH LIPNER, ANTHONY MOHR and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6220

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH LIPNER

ANTHONY MOHR

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CANTOR KIMBERLY

Defendant

PATRICIA CHACOPULOS TRUSTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VARTAZARIAN STEVE

Defendant Attorney

YANG REY S.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/9/2023: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)

10/2/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 10/02/2023

10/2/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 10/02/2023

Notice of Settlement

9/20/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

9/15/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

5/31/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/05/2023

5/5/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/05/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

5/5/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order)

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

4/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Opposition (name extension) Opposition PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY CANTOR’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/25/2023: Opposition (name extension) Opposition PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY CANTOR’S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT’S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF JOHANNA BOKTOR IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/24/2023: Ex Parte Application (name extension) Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION BY DEFENDANTS TO CONTINUE TRIAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF JOHANNA BOKTOR IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

4/6/2023: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

5/2/2022: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

4/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/27/2022: Case Management Statement

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/5/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/11/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Kimberly Cantor on 12/17/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Kimberly Cantor as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Kimberly Cantor (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 10/02/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 04/03/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Kimberly Cantor (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
01/05/2022

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/02/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketUpdated -- Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee of the Survivor's Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust and as Trustee of the Bypass Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust; and d/b/a BRENTWOOD MANAGEMENT to Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketUpdated -- Adam Q. Feldman (Attorney): Middle Name changed from Quinn to Q.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketAddress for Adam Q. Feldman (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kimberly Cantor (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee of the Survivor's Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust and as Trustee of the Bypass Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust; and d/b/a BRENTWOOD MANAGEMENT (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kimberly Cantor (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee of the Survivor's Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust and as Trustee of the Bypass Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust; and d/b/a BRENTWOOD MANAGEMENT (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kimberly Cantor (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Chacopulos, Trustee of the Survivor's Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust and as Trustee of the Bypass Trust Under the George Chacopulos Trust; and d/b/a BRENTWOOD MANAGEMENT (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less