This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2023 at 10:43:33 (UTC).

KIMBERLY BISHOP ET AL VS CERTAINTEED CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 KIMBERLY BISHOP filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CERTAINTEED CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0379

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BISHOP MATTHEW

BISHOP KIMBERLY

BISHOP ERIC

BISHOP PETER

Defendants

WESTBURNE SUPPLY INC.

J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC.

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

FAMILIAN CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRAYTON ALAN RICHARD ESQ.

DONADIO DAVID ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

FOLEY PATRICK J.

LIN CARRIE

MCGAH SEAN C.

JAMES JON CHARLES

MEYERS LESA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

1/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP - (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

Order - Dismissal

1/25/2023: Order - Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/7/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

11/9/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/20/2022: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

9/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: GROUP (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

Request for Dismissal

9/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Response - RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

8/11/2022: Response - RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/12/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

6/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL IN PROGRESS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

6/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (BISHOP-BC690379))

6/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (BISHOP-BC690379))

320 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2024
  • Hearing01/26/2024 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Group - (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by KIMBERLY BISHOP ET AL on 01/16/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Familian Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: H & L Supply, Inc. (Doe2) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Keenan Properties, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Westburne Supply, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference re: Group (BRAYTON PURCELL, LLP))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
404 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDocument:Statement of Damages Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDocument:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketDocument:Statement of Damages Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Eric Bishop (Plaintiff); Kimberly Bishop (Plaintiff); Matthew Bishop (Plaintiff); Peter Bishop (Plaintiff); As to: H & L Supply, Inc. (Doe2) (Defendant); Service Date: 06/04/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Eric Bishop (Plaintiff); Kimberly Bishop (Plaintiff); Matthew Bishop (Plaintiff); Peter Bishop (Plaintiff); As to: H & L Supply, Inc. (Doe2) (Defendant); Type: Fictitious Name

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCase Cross Reference: Coordinated Case(s) CV & JCCP4674

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSpecial Status Start:Judicial Council Coordinated Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketSpecial Status Start:Case Determined to be Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Asbestos--PI/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less