This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 04:55:00 (UTC).

KIMBERLY ANNE HALL VS PERSONAL STORAGE SPACES ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 KIMBERLY ANNE HALL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PERSONAL STORAGE SPACES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8024

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HALL KIMBERLY ANNE

Defendants and Respondents

PERSONAL STORAGE SPACES

DOES 1 TO 20

PERSONAL STORAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PANNELL JONATHAN M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WALTER LAWRENCE A. LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

12/13/2018: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

4/5/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF PERSONAL STORAGE ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS PERSONAL STORAGE SPACES

9/5/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF PERSONAL STORAGE ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS PERSONAL STORAGE SPACES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/5/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Other -

7/21/2017: Other -

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Kimberly Anne Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Kimberly Anne Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF PERSONAL STORAGE ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS PERSONAL STORAGE SPACES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by PERSONAL STORAGE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Personal Storage Spaces (Legacy Party); PERSONAL STORAGE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Kimberly Anne Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Kimberly Anne Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Kimberly Anne Hall (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC668024    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 29

Hall v. Personal Storage Spaces

Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement Against Plaintiff Under CCP Section 664.6, Request for Costs and Sanctions and Attorney Fees Under CCP Section 128.5 Against Plaintiff is CONTINUED to 5/4/2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Based on current conditions, including, but not limited to, the spread of COVID-19, the need for social distancing, and a state of emergency having been declared by Governor Newsom, the court finds good cause to continue the hearing on this motion to 5/4/2020.

The Court is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC668024    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: 29

Hall v. Personal Storage Spaces

The unopposed Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Kimberly Ann Hall, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. The order shall be effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the signed order on the client. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(e). Counsel remains counsel of record until the proof of service is filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC668024    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 29

Hall v. Personal Storage Spaces

The unopposed Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Kimberly Ann Hall, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. The order shall be effective upon the filing of a proof of service of the signed order on the client. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(e). Counsel will remain counsel of record until the proof of service of the signed order is filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC668024    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 2

Hall v. Personal Storage Spaces, et al.

Defendant’s Two Motions to Compel Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories, Set Three; and Supplemental Request for Production of Documents, Set Three filed on 10/16/19, are DENIED as moot. Plaintiff served verified responses to the foregoing discovery without objections on 10/25/19. Cal Code Civ Procedure §2030.290(b).

The request for sanctions is also DENIED. Based on the facts and circumstances set forth in the opposition papers (including the fact that Plaintiff is homeless and has had difficulties in communicating with counsel), the Court declines to impose sanctions at this time. The Court finds that the imposition of sanctions would be unjust. The Court admonishes Plaintiff and her counsel that she must comply with her discovery obligations in a timely manner.

The Moving Party is ordered to give notice.